SHERWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1158333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 November 2016 On time Download