SHERWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1158333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY HILTON Trustee 07 July 2016 None on record
HANNAH MALHOTRA Trustee 11 July 2016 None on record
JILL GREGORY Chair 18 May 2015 None on record
Maxine Leigh Trustee 05 July 2019 None on record
MARGARET IRENE HILTON Trustee 18 May 2015 None on record
Deborah Seaborn Trustee 05 July 2019 None on record
LOUISE HOLLAND Trustee 18 May 2015 None on record
Dawn Evans Trustee 14 November 2018 None on record
VALERIE HUNTER Trustee 18 May 2015 None on record