Accounts and annual returns CONCERT THEATRE
Charity number: 1160163
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 September 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 70 days late | |
Annual return | 25 September 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 241 days late | |
Annual return | 25 September 2021 | 22 March 2024 | 606 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2021 | 22 March 2024 | 606 days late | |
Annual return | 25 September 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 254 days late | |
Annual return | 25 September 2019 | 29 April 2021 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2019 | 29 April 2021 | 278 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window