Financial history CURE EB (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SOHANA RESEARCH FUND)

Charity number: 1158672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £853.17k £774.58k £1.06m £796.94k £1.57m
Total expenditure £997.29k £1.16m £755.27k £759.77k £858.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £853.17k £774.05k £1.06m £791.35k £1.57m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £524 £4.77k £5.58k £2
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £893.36k £1.14m £696.93k £735.50k £820.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £104.18k £18.58k £58.35k £24.27k £38.03k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £16.60k £38.07k £9.90k £56.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £893.36k £650.70k £620.69k £591.59k £764.77k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0