HOSPITALITY AND HOPE

Charity number: 1159213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a leading food insecurity, homelessness, and community well-being charity. Our main services aim is to reduce food insecurity by providing a foodbank and network of community shops. Reduce homelessness by providing supported living accommodation. Improve our community's wellbeing by delivering evidence-based interventions and advocating and campaigning alongside our community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £251,339
Total expenditure: £636,614

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • South Tyneside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 2014: CIO registration
  • 15 March 2016: Funds received from 1121702 HOSPITALITY & HOPE
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Lynne McKenna MBE Chair 21 September 2023
None on record
Julie Anne Atkinson-McGregor Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Anne Hetherington Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Karen Richardson Trustee 16 August 2022
THE CHILDRENS FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Magnus Peter Robert Willis Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Louise Lydon Trustee 21 October 2021
CLEADON C OF E ACADEMY PTFA
Recently registered
SIR DAVID ROBERT MACGOWAN CHAPMAN BT Trustee 23 February 2017
CHAPMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GISELA GRAHAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MS SUE CHILTON Trustee 01 December 2014
PRIMROSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £294.71k £371.08k £487.76k £422.31k £694.48k
Total expenditure £248.36k £324.03k £386.69k £420.20k £636.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £66.00k £97.52k £81.00k £118.26k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £75.68k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £130.15k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £43.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.51k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £625.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.47k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £553.24k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £349.13k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.64k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 21 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 26 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 26 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 06 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 06 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hampden Street Day Centre
Hampden Street
SOUTH SHIELDS
NE33 4JR
Phone:
0191 420 3336