LEDBURY AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 505102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 September 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 August 2018 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 02 July 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required