Accounts and annual returns BIRSTALL BAG'S

Charity number: 1160190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 09 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 23 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 09 February 2023 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 10 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 21 April 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 23 July 2019 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required