Financial history BIRSTALL BAG'S

Charity number: 1160190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £24.78k £20.09k £14.88k £3.25k £7.99k
Total expenditure £29.08k £21.87k £14.51k £3.08k £5.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A