HARMSTON YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 505105
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 March 2021 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 March 2021 789 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required