HARMSTON YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 505105
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.52k £10.21k £10.34k £7.46k £10.85k
Total expenditure £6.65k £8.25k £11.42k £10.07k £8.79k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A