PRINCE OF WALES ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK & IRELAND

Charity number: 1158526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Davidson Sawyerr Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
DILYS BENJAMIN Trustee 21 October 2018 None on record
MR Wilfred Isaac Charles Macfoy Trustee 18 October 2015 None on record
PATRICK DIXON Trustee 18 October 2015 None on record
NORMAN THOMPSON Trustee 20 October 2019 None on record
KHADIRU HADIRR MAHDI Trustee 18 October 2015 None on record
Dr Lucien Raymond Turay Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
EUGENE GERARD DENNIS BENJAMIN Chair 18 October 2015 None on record
Donald Hudson Cecil Asgill Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
ESTHER NANCY BOLAJI Trustee 21 October 2018 None on record
Dr HAZELL SHOKELLU THOMPSON Trustee 21 October 2018 None on record
PASTOR DUDLEY HANCILES Trustee 18 November 2015 None on record
Rev Ian Luke-Macauley Trustee 18 October 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS, CLAPHAM COMMON Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK KENNINGTON Received: On time
RUTH ELIZABETH LATILAWA AGU Trustee 15 October 2017 None on record
Dr Mohamed Sorie Ibrahim Kamara Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
REMMIE AKIBO-BETTS Trustee 21 October 2018 None on record
EDMOND ROGERS BASCHO-GEORGE Trustee 20 October 2019 None on record
Dr ALEX FESTUS JONATHAN BLANSHARD Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Dr KAYODE ROBBIN-COKER Trustee 18 October 2015 None on record