COUNSELLING FOR SOCIAL CHANGE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of free and low cost counselling in South West England (Cornwall and Devon). We also provide counselling for activists across the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 20 January 2015: Standard registration
- CSC (Working name)
- COUNSELLING FOR SOCIAL CHANGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Harmer | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elfrea Harmony Lockley | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Allen | Trustee | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
BEE SHELDON-HOWKINS | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.58k | £49.20k | £62.95k | £65.90k | £111.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.43k | £47.73k | £54.46k | £68.78k | £92.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/12/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PEOPLE SUFFERING TRAUMA AND OTHER MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AS A RESULT OF CAMPAIGN, CARE AND RELIEF WORK BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mor Workspace
Treloggan Lane
NEWQUAY
Cornwall
TR7 2FP
- Phone:
- 03330508825
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window