LYTHAM PERFORMING ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a festival environment for both young people and adults in music, singing, musical instruments, speech and drama on an annual basis so that the participants gain experience and enjoyment in the different performing arts. Classes are almost always competitive with the Festival bringing in professional adjudicators to develop talents and provide feedback.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 January 2015: CIO registration
- 25 June 2015: Funds received from 1037184 LYTHAM ST ANNES FESTIVAL OF PERFORMING ARTS
- LYTHAM ST ANNES FESTIVAL OF PERFORMING ARTS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Julie Mills | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna June Cross | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John McVitie | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Kirk | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Stephanie Dawn Heney | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Joanne Ireland | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.43k | £13 | £5.12k | £10.18k | £6.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.50k | £2.67k | £5.55k | £7.52k | £8.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jan 2015 as amended on 04 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA, DANCE AND OTHER PERFORMING ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Kingsway
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
Lancashire
FY8 1AB
- Phone:
- 07780777958
- Email:
- STEPHANIEHENEY3@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
lythamperformingarts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window