TETTENHALL TRANSPORT HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity number: 1160431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 02 March 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 19 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 08 October 2018 222 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 19 June 2018 111 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required