Financial history POWER TO CHANGE TRUST

Charity number: 1159982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £1.20m £1.60m £10.64m £5.71m £7.16m
Total expenditure £22.19m £28.95m £39.92m £15.86m £11.83m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £2.00k £51.26k
Income from government grants £110.00k £650.00k £257.00k £4.81m £6.58m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £5.00k £21.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £110.00k £650.00k £10.26m £5.64m £7.05m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.09m £948.00k £373.00k £49.00k £114.78k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.07m £28.88m £39.90m £15.80m £11.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £120.00k £68.00k £18.00k £57.00k £80.08k
Expenditure - Governance £270.00k £292.00k £372.00k £314.00k £439.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.37m £21.38m £25.74m £7.72m £4.86m
Expenditure - Investment management £120.00k £0 £18.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0