Accounts and annual returns TVRS CARES LIMITED

Charity number: 1160267
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 19 May 2023 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 03 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 03 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 23 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 23 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 27 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window