Financial history TVRS CARES LIMITED

Charity number: 1160267
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £84.89k £78.71k £75.11k £67.06k £6.96k
Total expenditure £83.83k £75.77k £84.73k £72.91k £16.65k
Income from government contracts £26.65k £78.71k N/A £67.06k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £48.00k N/A N/A