ASYLUM ACADEMY FOR EXTREME SPORTS

Charity number: 1159288
Charity reporting is overdue by 65 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £102.50k £127.81k £154.58k £158.41k £276.92k
Total expenditure £99.04k £121.46k £145.29k £177.14k £129.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £112.71k