BRITON FERRY COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1160048
Charity reporting is up to date (140 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 June 2019 09 September 2020 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 June 2019 09 September 2020 140 days late Download
Annual return 22 June 2018 23 October 2019 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 June 2018 23 October 2019 184 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 March 2018 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 March 2018 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download