BLURTON COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1161082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 February 2021 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 February 2021 377 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2021 742 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 February 2021 742 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 February 2021 1105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 March 2019 420 days late Download