BLURTON COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1161082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.04k £19.19k £880.66k £12.44k £13.44k
Total expenditure £5.04k £24.31k £828.48k £13.79k £12.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £500 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £828.48k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A