ROCKY'S ROBINS

Charity number: 1159318
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2020 29 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 29 March 2021 58 days late Download
Annual return 30 March 2019 29 March 2021 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2019 29 March 2021 424 days late Download
Annual return 30 March 2018 26 February 2020 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2018 26 February 2020 392 days late Download
Annual return 30 March 2017 02 April 2018 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2017 02 April 2018 62 days late Download
Annual return 30 March 2016 29 March 2018 423 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2016 29 March 2018 423 days late Download