ROCKY'S ROBINS

Charity number: 1159318
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/03/2016 30/03/2017 30/03/2018 30/03/2019 30/03/2020
Total gross income £898 £120 £425 £203 £105
Total expenditure £339 £235 £321 £98 £65
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A