WHITBY HIDDEN IMPAIRMENTS SUPPORT AND HELP

Charity number: 1160390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEN NEWTON Trustee 16 February 2016 None on record
BRENDA LYTH Trustee 09 February 2015 None on record
Cheryl Newton Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Michelle Collinson Trustee 19 July 2017 None on record
Emma Locker Trustee 20 September 2016 None on record
JENNY MENDELSOHN Trustee 09 February 2015 None on record