NIDDERDALE COMMUNITY SERVICES CENTRE

Charity number: 1159353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.40k £2.34k £2.02k £646 £1.15k
Total expenditure £2.94k £2.59k £1.24k £1.08k £1.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A