Financial history WEST HARTLEPOOL SCHOLARSHIP FUND FOR GIRLS (ENGLISH MARTYRS SCHOOL)

Charity number: 505144
Charity reporting is overdue by 1237 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £0 £217 £113 £203 £122
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A