Accounts and annual returns TALENT ENGAGED ACADEMY

Charity number: 1158559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 September 2021 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 September 2021 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 October 2020 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 October 2020 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 September 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 23 September 2019 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 13 September 2018 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 13 September 2018 105 days late Download Open in new window