Financial history TALENT ENGAGED ACADEMY

Charity number: 1158559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £202.37k £245.53k £211.46k £273.13k £315.46k
Total expenditure £227.74k £234.76k £190.20k £315.29k £324.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £29.46k