Accounts and annual returns THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD COVENANT RESTORATION ASSEMBLY FREEDOM HOUSE PARISH

Charity number: 1158458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 02 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 02 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required