Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD COVENANT RESTORATION ASSEMBLY FREEDOM HOUSE PARISH

Charity number: 1158458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.20k £8.17k £11.12k £3.74k £12.00k
Total expenditure £7.10k £7.40k £8.68k £3.50k £9.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A