HOLMER GREEN YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1160911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time Download