HOLMER GREEN YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1160911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.15k £19.71k £15.26k £21.19k £15.51k
Total expenditure £21.61k £20.42k £17.05k £19.23k £14.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £943 £1.63k £3.26k £3.00k