Accounts and annual returns THE LORD BRENNAN CATHOLIC EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1160864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window