Financial history THE LORD BRENNAN CATHOLIC EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1160864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £36.74k £7.56k £18.36k £20.02k £5.67k
Total expenditure £113.37k £7.44k £7.41k £7.65k £56.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A