JUBILEE+

Charity Number: 1159799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's Objects are to promote social inclusion for the public benefit, particularly but not exclusively by providing networking, education and training, to prevent people from becoming socially excluded focusing on ways and means of relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society, in accordance with Christian principles.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £306,265
Total expenditure: £186,408

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 January 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • JUBILEE PLUS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM NEIL ANNS Chair 20 June 2013
CHRIST CENTRAL CHURCHES WORLDWIDE
Received: On time
Samuel John Ward Trustee 02 May 2025
VISIBLE MINISTRIES
Received: On time
Kathryn Jayne Osborn Trustee 01 March 2024
ACUMEN ACADEMY UK
Received: On time
Susmitha Joanna Bleasdale Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Andrew James Biggs Trustee 26 March 2020
None on record
Kate Welch Trustee 29 July 2015
COMMUNITIES TOGETHER DURHAM
Received: On time
ACUMEN COMMUNITY BUILDINGS
Received: On time
Dr ANDREW JOHN MCWILLIAM Trustee 20 June 2013
ALTRINCHAM CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £80.27k £121.84k £107.92k £125.54k £306.27k
Total expenditure £75.11k £108.39k £88.00k £117.24k £186.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 26 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 26 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Hastings Centre
The Ridge
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN34 2SA
Phone:
01424 755990