Financial history FRITH YOUTH CENTRE, BUSSAGE

Charity number: 1162806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £33.44k £17.64k £27.76k £54.17k £43.08k
Total expenditure £42.36k £34.11k £27.56k £36.54k £43.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.81k N/A £8.50k £24.64k £30.50k