REGATHER CHARITY

Charity number: 1159236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 August 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 13 August 2020 14 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 29 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 01 October 2018 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 01 October 2018 63 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 02 August 2017 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 07 September 2017 39 days late Download