Accounts and annual returns BASIC SPORTS & FITNESS (BSF CHARITY)
Charity number: 1162212

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 11 June 2019 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 11 June 2019 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 17 May 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 17 May 2018 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window