Financial history BASIC SPORTS & FITNESS (BSF CHARITY)

Charity number: 1162212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £27.50k £41.49k £42.22k £34.00k £18.31k
Total expenditure £26.96k £34.38k £34.32k £32.65k £19.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.90k N/A