BEDALE COMMUNITY MINIBUS

Charity number: 1158623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 November 2018 28 October 2019 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2018 28 October 2019 57 days late Download
Annual return 30 October 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 November 2016 02 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 14 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 14 July 2016 On time Download