HUA XIAN CHINESE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1160071
Charity reporting is 1028 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not yet received
298 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not yet received
298 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not yet received
663 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not yet received
663 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not yet received
1028 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not yet received
1028 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 January 2018 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2018 350 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)