DEFENCE ACADEMY ATHLETICS UNION

Charity number: 1160122
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 August 2017 On time Download