DEFENCE ACADEMY ATHLETICS UNION

Charity number: 1160122
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £161.14k £113.06k £105.79k £106.28k £74.85k
Total expenditure £154.07k £105.20k £110.17k £105.16k £71.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A