FRIENDS OF ST. MICHAELS AND ALL ANGELS

Charity number: 1164141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.88k £8.19k £5.80k £14.48k £10.20k
Total expenditure £0 £17.15k £3.54k £3.54k £6.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A