IPSWICH AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1159595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £1.38m £164.33k £49.74k £29.60k £59.08k
Total expenditure £38.64k £69.43k £69.82k £66.43k £65.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.37m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £2.52k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £819 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £11.31k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £35.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A