MAHOUTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 26 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 16 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 16 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 12 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 27 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 26 May 2017 On time Download