MAHOUTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £28.13k £48.00k £82.52k £408.49k £75.01k
Total expenditure £31.62k £44.48k £87.96k £157.85k £137.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A