ST CLARE'S HOSPICE

Charity number: 1159481
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 309 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 309 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 675 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 675 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1040 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1040 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 December 2016 On time Download