Accounts and annual returns BRACKNELL NEPALESE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1159278
Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Annual return 06 April 2022 27 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2021 27 July 2022 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2020 07 June 2021 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2019 06 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 Not Required