Financial history BRACKNELL NEPALESE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1159278
Charity reporting is overdue by 131 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022
Total gross income £2.31k £2.77k £2.18k £1.47k £2.86k
Total expenditure £2.04k £1.94k £3.37k £2.11k £2.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A